EP0516341 - A chair tilting mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASHFIELD ENGINEERING COMPANY WEXFORD LIMITED 61, The Bull Ring Wexford / IE | [1992/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hancock, William John Glenville Road Clonard, County Wexford / IE | 02 /
Hancock, Steven William Glenville Road Clonard, County Wexford / IE | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Weldon, Michael James, et al Cruickshank & Company 8A Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Weldon, Michael James, et al c/o Cruickshank & Co., 1 Holles Street Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [1992/49] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304612.2 | 21.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | IE19910001724 | 21.05.1991 Original published format: IE 172491 | IE19910002516 | 18.07.1991 Original published format: IE 251691 | IE19910003089 | 03.09.1991 Original published format: IE 308991 | IE19770000092 | 10.03.1992 Original published format: IE 77092 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516341 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/032 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
A47C1/0325 (EP,US);
A47C1/03255 (EP,US);
A47C1/03266 (EP,US);
A47C1/03272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Schaukelmechanismus für Stühle | [1992/49] | English: | A chair tilting mechanism | [1992/49] | French: | Mécanisme à bascule pour chaises | [1992/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/25] | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2830650 (ANTON LORENZ); | [X]DE1404662 (SCHLIEPHACKE FRIDTJOF F); | [A]FR2067806 (LEMOINE EMILIE); | [A]EP0341344 (STEIFENSAND MARTIN F [DE]); | [X]EP0418731 (VOELKLE ROLF [DE]) |