EP0517419 - Draft control system with safety disconnect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon Essex SS14 3AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | ||
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND FORD LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | ||
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND FORD LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornell, Charles R. 1427 Terrance Drive Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | 02 /
Strosser, Richard P. 140 Dogwood Drive Akron, Pennsylvania 17540 / US | 03 /
Macqueene, James William 6148 Knollwood Road, No.306 Willowbrook, Illinois 60514 / US | 04 /
Young, Steven C. 329 Bracken Drive Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17601 / US | 05 /
Swierenga, Garrett E. 322 N. Cass Avenue Westmont, Illinois 60559 / US | 06 /
Nielsen, Bradley A. 41 Ashlea Gardens New Holland, Pennsylvania 17557 / US | 07 /
Sokol, David G. 158 Hill Road New Holland, Pennsylvania 17557 / US | 08 /
Miller, Matthew T. 1203 West Fifth Street Waterloo, Iowa 50702 / US | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Singleton, Jeffrey Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Singleton, Jeffrey Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304811.0 | 28.05.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | US19910709236 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709236 | US19910709237 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709237 | US19910709184 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709184 | US19910709185 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: US 709185 | US19910757173 | 10.09.1991 Original published format: US 757173 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0517419 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0517419 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517419 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/42, A01B63/114, E02F9/20 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
B60D1/42 (EP);
A01B63/112 (EP);
A01B63/114 (EP);
E02F9/2029 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/50] | B60D1/42, A01B63/114 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/50] | Title | German: | Regelsystem für Anhängerkupplung mit Entkupplungssicherheitsvorrichtung | [1992/50] | English: | Draft control system with safety disconnect | [1992/50] | French: | Système de réglage avec décrochage de sécurité pour un attelage | [1992/50] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 17.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3838496 ; | [A]US4132273 ; | [A]US4796712 | [AD] - SAE technical paper no 901561 "development of the Electronic Draft Control System for the Ford New Holland 8210 Tractor |