EP0516420 - Ink jet recording method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Atsushi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hirabayashi, Hiromitsu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nagoshi, Shigeyasu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Akiyama, Yuji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Sugimoto, Hitoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Matsubara, Miyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304848.2 | 28.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | JP19910129500 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: JP 12950091 | JP19910129501 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: JP 12950191 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516420 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516420 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516420 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/205 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
G06K15/107 (EP,US);
B41J2/2132 (EP,US);
G06K15/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Farbstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren und Vorrichtung | [1992/49] | English: | Ink jet recording method and apparatus | [1992/49] | French: | Méthode et dispositif d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.08.1996 | BE | 28.08.1996 | CH | 28.08.1996 | DK | 28.08.1996 | ES | 28.08.1996 | GR | 28.08.1996 | LI | 28.08.1996 | NL | 28.08.1996 | PT | 28.11.1996 | SE | 28.11.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
BE | 28.08.1996 | ||
CH | 28.08.1996 | ||
DK | 28.08.1996 | ||
ES | 28.08.1996 | ||
GR | 28.08.1996 | ||
LI | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
BE | 28.08.1996 | ||
CH | 28.08.1996 | ||
DK | 28.08.1996 | ||
GR | 28.08.1996 | ||
LI | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
BE | 28.08.1996 | ||
CH | 28.08.1996 | ||
DK | 28.08.1996 | ||
LI | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
BE | 28.08.1996 | ||
CH | 28.08.1996 | ||
LI | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
BE | 28.08.1996 | ||
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
PT | 28.11.1996 | ||
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | AT | 28.08.1996 | |
SE | 28.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 28.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1120356 ; | [A]US4087825 (CHEN WINSTON HSONG, et al); | [A]US4178597 (ISAYAMA TAKURO [JP], et al); | [X]EP0300743 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [X]EP0348181 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]US4992806 (PEER THOMAS R [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 360 (M-858)(3708) 11 August 1989 & JP-A-11 20 356 ( CANON INC ) 12 May 1989, & JP1120356 A 19890512 |