EP0517442 - Transferring lines in a digital SLC system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1992/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bye, Peter Lloyd 17 Washington Court Livingston, New Jersey 07039 / US | 02 /
Miller, James Harold 19 Chestnut Hill Road Randolph, New Jersey 07869 / US | 03 /
Ronnen, Eva 40 Ascot Drive Wayside, New Jersey 07712 / US | 04 /
Spencer, Steven Peter 61 Belmont Drive Livingston, New Jersey 07039 / US | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304898.7 | 29.05.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | US19910710474 | 05.06.1991 Original published format: US 710474 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0517442 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0517442 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517442 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
H04Q11/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/50] | Title | German: | Umlegen von Leitungen in einem digitalen Übertragungssystem-SLC | [1992/50] | English: | Transferring lines in a digital SLC system | [1992/50] | French: | Transfert de lignes dans un système de transmission digitale SLC | [1992/50] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62175098 ; | [A]WO8404644 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract * * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 21 *; | [A]EP0325318 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0371570 (DSC COMMUNICATIONS [US]) [A] 1,2,4,8-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 1 * * column 5, line 30 - line 42 * * column 8, line 25 - column 9, line 46 *; | [A] - BORDERS, "The role of the time slot interchanger in the subscriber loop", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL COMMUNICATIONS FORUM, OAK BROOK, ILLINOIS US, (19880930), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 616 - 623, XP000053218 [A] 1-3,8-10 * page 618, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 618, column R, paragraph 5 - page 619, column R, paragraph 3 * | [A] - HASEGAWA ET AL., IEEE/IEICE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE 1987, SESSION 28, PAPER 3, TOKYO JP, (19871115), vol. 2, pages 1096 - 1100 [A] 1,8 * section 2: 'Reconfiguration on hubbing DCS networks' * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880119), vol. 12, no. 17, Database accession no. (E - 574), & JP62175098 A 19870731 (HITACHI) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |