EP0525951 - Automatic repositioning of mirrors mounted within concave-shaped boundaries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE, Inc. 5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn Michigan 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE, Inc. 5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barrs, John A. 510 East Elmwood, Apt. 2A Clawson, Michigan 48017 / US | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305063.7 | 02.06.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | US19910739533 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: US 739533 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0525951 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0525951 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/35, G05B19/4061 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
G05B19/351 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37462 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41275 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45185 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49137 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49143 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/05] | G05B19/37, G05B19/405 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | Wiederpositionierung von in einem konkavförmigen begrenzten Raum montierten Spiegeln | [1993/05] | English: | Automatic repositioning of mirrors mounted within concave-shaped boundaries | [1993/05] | French: | Repositionnement automatique de miroirs montés dans un espace limité de forme concave | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/42] | 12.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61147307 ; | [Y]US4758961 (UEMURA KAZUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column A; figure 5; claims 1,8 *; | [DY]US4929878 (HANSEN RANDALL F [US]) [DY] 1 * column A; figures 1,3-5; claims 1,2,4-6 *; | [E]EP0490734 (RENAULT [FR]) [E] 1 * figure 4; claims 2-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861122), vol. 10, no. 348, Database accession no. (P - 519)<2404>, & JP61147307 A 19860705 (TOYODA) [A] 1 * abstract * |