EP0518671 - Bulb socket and terminal installed thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LIMITED 10-18, Higashi-gotanda 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LIMITED 10-18, Higashi-gotanda 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LIMITED 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LIMITED 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Shinji 7-36, Nagosakae-machi 3-chome Suzuka-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Masayoshi 860-3, Tsumata, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1992/51] | Flegg, Christopher Frederick, et al Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305378.9 | 11.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | JP19910043541 | 11.06.1991 Original published format: JP 4354191 | JP19910043542 | 11.06.1991 Original published format: JP 4354291 | JP19910043922 | 12.06.1991 Original published format: JP 4392291 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518671 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518671 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518671 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/46 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
H01R33/46 (EP,US);
H01R13/432 (EP,US);
H01R33/94 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/51] | Title | German: | Lampenfassung und daran montierte Anschlussklemme | [1992/51] | English: | Bulb socket and terminal installed thereon | [1992/51] | French: | Culot de lampe et borne de raccordement montée dessus | [1992/51] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/51: Teilanmeldung 96116203.9 eingereicht am 10/10/96 | EPB 1996/51: Divisional application 96116203.9 filed on 10/10/96 | EPB 1996/51: Demande divisionnaire 96116203.9 déposée le 10/10/96 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 27.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96116203.9 / EP0756356 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2165711 (MECANISMOS AUX IND); | [A]US3489891 (ALTISSIMO RENATO); | [A]FR1129946 (PHILIPS NV) |