EP0521633 - Tamper evident container and closure assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davis, Eugene Edward 72a Hamilton Avenue Barkingside Ilford, IG6 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states Davis, Eugene Edward 72a Hamilton Avenue Barkingside, Ilford, IG6 1AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Joseph Martin WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [1993/01] | Application number, filing date | 92305549.5 | 17.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | GB19910014610 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9114610 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521633 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/48 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B65D41/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Behälter mit Originalitätsverschluss | [1993/01] | English: | Tamper evident container and closure assembly | [1993/01] | French: | Ensemble de récipients et fermeture avec temion de spoliation | [1993/01] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/09] | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2314864 ; | [Y]GB2116155 ; | [X]DE1814680 ; | [X]AU1003076 ; | [X]US4694971 ; | [X]US4709823 ; | [X]GB1507868 ; | [A]US4989740 |