EP0520701 - An integrated solution to high voltage load dump conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton, TX 75006-5039 / US | [1999/08] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS, INC. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iannuzo, James M. 2102 E. Friess Drive Phoenix, Arizona 85022 / US | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1993/01] | Application number, filing date | 92305652.7 | 19.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | US19910724537 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: US 724537 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520701 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520701 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
H01L27/0248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Integrierte Schaltungslösung für Lastabfallzustände unter Hochspannung | [1993/01] | English: | An integrated solution to high voltage load dump conditions | [1993/01] | French: | Solution intégrée à des conditions de chute de charge à hautes tensions | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.09.2001 | [2008/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2092377 (RCA CORP); | [A]EP0226469 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | Examination | EP0492032 |