EP0519740 - Signal routing technique for high frequency electronic systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abernathy, Michael G. 16811 Ashbridge Court Spring, Texas 77379 / US | 02 /
Fletcher, Angie M. 8427 Burwood Park Drive Spring, Texas 77379 / US | 03 /
Santeler, Paul 13211 Misty Hills Drive Cypress, Texas 77429 / US | 04 /
Thoma III, Roy E. 11514 Taos Lane Houston, Texas 77070 / US | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305658.4 | 19.06.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | US19910719119 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: US 719119 | [1992/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0519740 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0519740 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/00, G06F1/16 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
H05K1/0216 (EP,US);
H05K1/0237 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09254 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10689 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/52] | Title | German: | Signalleittechnik für hochfrequente elektronische Systeme | [1992/52] | English: | Signal routing technique for high frequency electronic systems | [1992/52] | French: | Technique d'acheminement de signaux pour des systèmes électroniques à haute fréquence | [1992/52] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/26] | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02304994 ; | [A]US3418641 (FYFE THOMAS A, et al); | [A]US5010493 (MATSUMOTO KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4251784 (LUETZELSCHWAB ROLAND C, et al); | [A]US4167714 (FLORA LAURENCE P) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 94 (E-1041)6 March 1991 & JP-A-02 304 994 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 18 December 1990, & JP02304994 A 19901218 |