EP0520737 - Spin welding system for connecting an end cap to a filter element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/01] | Filter assembly with a spin welded end cap | ||
[1998/29] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 30 Sea Cliff Avenue Glen Cove, New York 11542 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 30 Sea Cliff Avenue Glen Cove New York 11542 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reed, Clayton Lew 438 Nye Road R.D. No.3 Cortland, New York 13045 / US | 02 /
Ryan, John E., Jr. 44 Union Street Cortland, New York 13045 / US | 03 /
German, Bruce R. Bos 335 Tupper Road Locke, New York 13092 / US | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305748.3 | 23.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | US19910723258 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: US 723258 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520737 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/00, B01D27/08, B01D29/11, B01D46/24 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B01D27/005 (EP,US);
B01D29/00 (KR);
B01D27/06 (EP,US);
B01D27/08 (EP,US);
B01D29/111 (EP,US);
B01D29/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Drehschweissystem zum Verbinden einer Endkappe an ein Filterelement | [1998/29] | English: | Spin welding system for connecting an end cap to a filter element | [1998/29] | French: | Système de soudage rotatif pour connecter un bouchon d'extrémité sur un élément filtrant | [1998/29] |
Former [1993/01] | Filteranordnung mit einer relationsgeschweissten Endkappe | ||
Former [1993/01] | Filter assembly with a spin welded end cap | ||
Former [1993/01] | Assemblage de filtres à un bouchon soudé par rotation | Examination procedure | 01.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 03.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/44] | 17.06.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/44] | Divisional application(s) | EP98204181.6 / EP0922476 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CA824484 (STONE FILTER COMPANY); | [A]US3547719 (KASTEN WALTER); | [A]US3850813 (PALL D, et al); | [A]DE3837423 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]GB2230472 (PALL CORP [US]) |