EP0521665 - Ampholyte terpolymers providing superior conditioning properties in shampoos and other hair care products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60 and Campbell's Run Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60 and Campbell's Run Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15205 / US | ||
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states Calgon Corporation Campbell's Run Road at Route 60 Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania / US | ||
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60-Campbell's Run Road Robinson Township Pennsylvania 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Shih-Ruey Thomas 1498 King Charles Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | 02 /
Vaughan, Craig W. RD1, Blackwood Road Freedom PA 15042 / US | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | ||
Former [1993/01] | Thompson, John Dr. Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305923.2 | 26.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | US19910722638 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: US 722638 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521665 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521665 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/5428 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Ampholytische Terpolymere mit verbesserten Konditionierungseigenschaften in Shampoozusammensetzungen und Haarpflegemitteln | [1993/01] | English: | Ampholyte terpolymers providing superior conditioning properties in shampoos and other hair care products | [1993/01] | French: | Terpolymères ampholytes avec des propriétés de conditionnement supérieur pour l'emploi de shampooing et d'autres produits pour les soins des cheveux | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4501834 (SU DEAN T [US]); | [A]EP0139588 (HOECHST FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP0217274 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0257826 (CALGON CORP [US]); | [A]US4806345 (BHATTACHARYYA BHUPATI R [US]); | [AP]GB2245585 (KAO CORP [JP]) |