EP0521707 - Food additive comprising water soluble hemicellulose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAN-EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-11, Sanwaa-Cho 1-Chome Toyonaka City Osaka 561 / JP | For all designated states FUJI OIL CO., LTD. 1-5, 2-Chome, Nishi-Shinsaibashi, Chuo-ku Osaka 542 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states SAN-EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-11, Sanwaa-Cho 1-Chome Toyonaka City, Osaka 561 / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJI OIL CO., LTD. 1-5, 2-Chome, Nishi-Shinsaibashi, Chuo-ku Osaka 542 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masutake, Kenji 12-630, Minaminoyama, Nishitada Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Hirokazu 4-2-3, Matsumaedai, Moriya-cho Kitasohma-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Kawamata, Toshimasa 5-20-9, Minami-Koshigaya Koshigaya-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Miyamae, Masatoshi 44, Mozuryonan-cho 1-chome Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Taguchi, Kenji 4-201, Shin-Matsudo Matsudo-shi, Chiba / JP | 06 /
Yonemitsu, Yoshiaki 976, Oaza Kubo, Kumatori-cho Sennan-gun, Osaka / JP | 07 /
Yoshizaki, Masahiro 24-9, Hama 1-chome, Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 08 /
Toyama, Tomoyuki 8-12, Tamagushi-cho, Higashi 1-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Hale, Stephen Geoffrey J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306065.1 | 01.07.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | JP19910189197 | 02.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18919791 | JP19910189198 | 02.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18919891 | JP19910189199 | 02.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18919991 | JP19910361565 | 21.12.1991 Original published format: JP 36156591 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521707 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521707 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0534 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A21D2/18 (EP,US);
A23C9/1307 (EP,US);
A23C9/137 (EP,US);
A23C9/1542 (EP,US);
A23G9/52 (EP,US);
A23J3/16 (EP,US);
A23L13/422 (EP,US);
A23L17/70 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/01] | Title | German: | Wasserlöslicher, Hemizellulose enthaltender Nahrungsmittelzusatz | [1993/01] | English: | Food additive comprising water soluble hemicellulose | [1993/01] | French: | Additif de produit alimentaire contenant de l'hémicellulose soluble dans l'eau | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP3049662 ; | [A]JP60027365 ; | [A]JP2016101 ; | [A]JP3058758 ; | [A]WO9005460 (NUTRASWEET CO [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 193 (C-832), 17 May 1991; & JP - A - 3049662 (NIPPON SHOKUHIN KAKO CO LTD) 04.03.1991, & JP3049662 A 19910517 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 145 (C-287), 20 June 1985; & JP - A - 60027365 (NIHON SHIYOKUHIN KAKOU KK) 12.02.1985, & JP60027365 A 19850620 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 146 (C-704), 20 March 1990; & JP - A - 2016101 (HOSOKAWA JUN) 19.01.1990, & JP2016101 A 19900320 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 206 (C-835), 27 May 1991; & JP - A - 3058758 (TAMOTSU IWAMOTO) 13.03.1991, & JP3058758 A 19910527 | Examination | JP3049662 | JP60027365 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 15, no. 193 (C-832), 17 May 1991; & JP - A - 3049662 (NIPPON SHOKUHIN KAKO CO LTD) 04.03. 1991, & JP3049662 A 19910517 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN,vol. 9, no. 145 (C-287), 20 June 1985; & JP - A - 60027365 (NIHON SHIYOKUHIN KAKOU KK) 12.02. 1985, & JP60027365 A 19850620 |