EP0550949 - Shield assembly for catheter placement units and other needle-bearing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville Florida 32611-2037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611-2037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melker, Richard J. 6101 Northwest 19th Place Gainesville, Florida 32610 / US | 02 /
Miller, Gary J. 531 Southwest 26th Place Gainesville, Florida 32601 / US | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1993/28] | Allman, Peter John MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306189.9 | 06.07.1992 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | US19920817998 | 09.01.1992 Original published format: US 817998 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550949 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M5/32 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
A61M25/0631 (EP);
A61M5/3243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Nadelschutzvorrichtung zum Einbringen von Kathetern oder dergleichen | [1993/28] | English: | Shield assembly for catheter placement units and other needle-bearing devices | [1993/28] | French: | Manchon protecteur pour unités de placement de catheter ou autres dispositifs portant aiguille | [1993/28] | File destroyed: | 01.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/45] | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.02.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9007104U ; | [X]US4160450 ; | [A]US4840185 |