EP0526012 - Dye-set for ink-jet printing inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/05] | Dye-set for polysaccharide-containing ink-jet printing inks | ||
[1997/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Loren E. 15690 Bernardo Center Drive, No. 2208 San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 02 /
Moffatt, John R. 4120 NW Pinecone Way, No. 7 Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306216.0 | 07.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | US19910737941 | 29.07.1991 Original published format: US 737941 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0526012 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0526012 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526012 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
C09D11/32 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/05] | Title | German: | Farbstoff-Set für Tintenstrahldrucktinten | [1997/23] | English: | Dye-set for ink-jet printing inks | [1997/23] | French: | Jeux de colorants pour encres d'impression par jet | [1997/23] |
Former [1993/05] | Farbstoff-Set für Polysaccharid enthaltende Tintenstrahldrucktinten | ||
Former [1993/05] | Dye-set for polysaccharide-containing ink-jet printing inks | ||
Former [1993/05] | Jeux de colorants pour encres d'impression par jet comportant des polysaccharides | Examination procedure | 10.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 05.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3337866 (SAKURA COLOR PROD CORP [JP]); | [X]DE3344648 (RICOH KK [JP]); | [X]US4818285 (CAUSLEY GARY C [US], et al) |