EP0522849 - Detection of engine fuel problems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanson, Jay Lowell 4402 West 89th St. Cir. Bloomington, Minnesota 55437 / US | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306283.0 | 08.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | US19910728467 | 11.07.1991 Original published format: US 728467 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522849 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522849 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22, F02B77/08 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
F02B77/08 (EP,US);
F02D17/04 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/02] | Title | German: | Erfassung von Kraftstoffproblemen bei einem Motor | [1993/02] | English: | Detection of engine fuel problems | [1993/02] | French: | Détection de problèmes de carburant dans des moteurs | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Request for further processing for: | 30.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.01.1996 | FR | 17.01.1996 | IT | 17.01.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 17.01.1996 | |
IT | 17.01.1996 | ||
FR | 14.06.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 17.01.1996 | |
FR | 14.06.1996 | ||
Former [1997/04] | FR | 14.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4960088 (HAVEMANN ROBERT K [US], et al); | [A]US4899706 (SASAKI ASAO [JP]); | [A]GB2199964 (DIESEL KIKI CO) | Examination | EP0306905 |