EP0527556 - Adjustable filter for differential microphones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1993/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elko, Gary Wayne 315 Ashland Road Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 02 /
Kubli, Robert Alfred 286 Rick Road Milford, New Jersey 08848 / US | 03 /
Morgan, Dennis R. 4 Sycamore Lane Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | 04 /
West, James Edward 510 Parkside Drive Plainfield, New Jersey 07060 / US | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/07] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) LTD. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306285.5 | 08.07.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | US19910731560 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: US 731560 | [1993/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0527556 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527556 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/04 | [1993/07] | CPC: |
H04R1/38 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
H04R3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/07] | Title | German: | Adjustierbarer Filter für Differentialmikrofone | [1993/07] | English: | Adjustable filter for differential microphones | [1993/07] | French: | Filtre adjustable pour microphones différentiels | [1993/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 05.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3630692 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]AT379274B (AKG AKUSTISCHE KINO GERAETE [AT]); | [A]US4393275 (FELDMAN STANLEY, et al) |