EP0534591 - Saw mill apparatus for castings and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wawrzyniak, Walter William 34452 Jefferson, No. C-39 Mt Clemens Michigan 48045 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states Wawrzyniak, Walter William 34452 Jefferson, No. C-39 Mt Clemens, Michigan 48045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1994/10] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1993/13] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306299.6 | 09.07.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | US19910733890 | 22.07.1991 Original published format: US 733890 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0534591 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0534591 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B22D31/00, B23D45/00, B23D47/04, B23D61/06, B23C5/08, B23D47/00, B23D59/02 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
B28D1/046 (EP,US);
B22D31/00 (EP,US);
B23D45/003 (EP,US);
B23D47/005 (EP,US);
B23D47/045 (EP,US);
B23D59/02 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1942 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1956 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303808 (EP,US);
Y10T409/305544 (EP,US);
Y10T409/305936 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30924 (EP,US);
Y10T83/263 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/13] | Title | German: | Sägefräsapparat für Gussstücke und Verfahren | [1993/13] | English: | Saw mill apparatus for castings and method | [1993/13] | French: | Appareil de sciage-fraisage pour pièces coulées et procédé | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/19] | 19.12.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD88178 ; | [A]DE2202901 (FRANSSON PER OLOF); | [A]US3872561 (POMERNACKI HENRY); | [A]DE2454640 (HEINLEIN HANS); | [A]US3844269 (RATER R) |