EP0523946 - Metallic gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON GASKET COMPANY Ltd. 248 Kanou Higashiosaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states NIPPON GASKET COMPANY Ltd. 248 Kanou Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Shigeru Morita Mansion 302, 942, Oogi-cho Daitou-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kubouchi, Kenji 3-10-1 Kitanakafuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Uemura, Hiroshi 3-1-5 Shinikeshima-cho Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Kunitoshi 395-1, Kanou Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306410.9 | 14.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | JP19910201207 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: JP 20120791 | JP19910214129 | 01.08.1991 Original published format: JP 21412991 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523946 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523946 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
F16J15/0825 (EP,US);
F16J2015/0837 (EP,US);
F16J2015/0843 (EP,US);
F16J2015/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/03] | Title | German: | Metalldichtung | [1993/03] | English: | Metallic gasket | [1993/03] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité métallique | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.1997
05.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Strasse 2 72581 Dettingen / DE Opponent's representative Röhl, Wolf Horst Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.1997
05.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Str. 2 72581 Dettingen/Ems / DE Opponent's representative Röhl, Wolf Horst, Dipl.-Phys., Dr. Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1997/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.1997
05.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Elring Klinger GmbH Max-Eyth-Str. 2 D-72581 Dettingen/Erms / DE Opponent's representative Röhl, Wolf Horst Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 04.12.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.06.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.10.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.11.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/06] | 28.11.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 07.01.2000 | Appeal received No. T0168/00 | 27.03.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.11.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2053382 (NICHOLSON T P); | [Y]US3053544 (GORSICA CHESTER J) | Examination | - Japanese Industrial Standards JIS G 4307 (1987), cold rolled stainless steel strip. |