EP0526033 - Benzimidazoles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ingall, Anthony Howard 53 Forest Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 3NW / GB | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae FISONS plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae FISONS plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | ||
Former [1993/05] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Fisons plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306426.5 | 14.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | GB19910015534 | 18.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115534 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526033 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/415, A61K31/44 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | PT [1993/05] | Title | German: | Benzimidazole | [1993/05] | English: | Benzimidazoles | [1993/05] | French: | Benzimidazoles | [1993/05] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 01.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/30] | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0220053 (FISONS PLC [GB]); | [XD]EP0262845 (FISONS PLC [GB]) |