EP0528535 - Electric cable barrier gland [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LIMITED Leighswood Road Aldridge Walsall Staffordshire WS9 8DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LIMITED Leighswood Road Aldridge Walsall Staffordshire WS9 8DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kennelly, Richard 99 Bramhall Avenue, Harwood Bolton, Lancashire BL2 4EX / GB | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Knowles, Audrey Elizabeth 624 Pershore Road Selly Park Birmingham B29 7HG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Knowles, Audrey Elizabeth 624 Pershore Road Selly Park Birmingham B29 7HG / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306435.6 | 14.07.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | GB19910015734 | 20.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115734 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528535 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528535 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/04 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
H02G15/04 (EP,US);
H02G3/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/08] | Title | German: | Kabelverschraubung mit Absperrung für elektrische Kabel | [1993/08] | English: | Electric cable barrier gland | [1993/08] | French: | Presse-étoupe à arrêt pour câble électrique | [1993/08] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.12.1996 | CH | 04.12.1996 | DK | 04.12.1996 | ES | 04.12.1996 | GR | 04.12.1996 | IT | 04.12.1996 | LI | 04.12.1996 | PT | 04.03.1997 | SE | 04.03.1997 | LU | 31.07.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
CH | 04.12.1996 | ||
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
ES | 04.12.1996 | ||
GR | 04.12.1996 | ||
IT | 04.12.1996 | ||
LI | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
CH | 04.12.1996 | ||
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
GR | 04.12.1996 | ||
IT | 04.12.1996 | ||
LI | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
CH | 04.12.1996 | ||
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
IT | 04.12.1996 | ||
LI | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
CH | 04.12.1996 | ||
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
LI | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
CH | 04.12.1996 | ||
LI | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
CH | 04.12.1996 | ||
LI | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | BE | 04.12.1996 | |
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/40] | BE | 04.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2295598 (BICC LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0024917 (BICC PLC [GB]); | [AD]GB2060281 (HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LTD); | [A]GB2104311 (HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LTD [GB]); | [AD]GB2104306 (HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LTD [GB]) |