EP0524823 - A resin composition and food packaging materials formed therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Horidome-cho, 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Horidome-cho, 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Kazuhiko 5-105, Izumi 38-banchi Abiko, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Hisazumi, Nobuyuki 11-9, Minato-machi 3-chome Tsuchiura, Ibaragi / JP | 03 /
Funabashi, Shinichiro 16-3, Inayoshi 5-chome, Chiyoda-machi Niihari-gun, Ibaragi / JP | 04 /
Ohba, Hiroyuki 7-23, Inayoshi 4-chome, Chiyoda-machi Niihari-gun, Ibaragi / JP | 05 /
Tanaka, Hideaki 18-2, Ohaza Kamitamari, Tamari-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaragi / JP | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1993/04] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306750.8 | 23.07.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | JP19910208896 | 26.07.1991 Original published format: JP 20889691 | JP19910066004U | 26.07.1991 Original published format: JP 6600491 U | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0524823 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0524823 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524823 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/05, C08K5/09, C08L29/04, C08J5/18, B65D85/72 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B65D65/38 (EP,US);
C08K5/053 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08J2329/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/053, C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/09, C08L29/04 (US,EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/04] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung und daraus hergestellte Verpackungsmaterialien für Lebensmittel | [1993/04] | English: | A resin composition and food packaging materials formed therefrom | [1993/04] | French: | Composition de résine et matière d'emballage formé à partir de celui-ci pour produits alimentaires | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1033449 [ ] (DU PONT); | US4206101 [ ] (WYSONG ROBERT D [US]); | EP0079712 [ ] (CLOROX CO [US]); | [XP] - MASANOBU NAGURA, JYUN MURAI, YUTAKA OHKOSHI, "STRUCTURE OF THE HYDROGELS OBTAINED BY BLENDING POLY(VINYL ALCOHOL) WITH ALGINIC ACID AND REPEATED FREEZING AND THAWING.", KOBUNSHI RONBUNSHU (JAPANESE POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY)., SOCIETY OF POLYMER SCIENCE, TOKYO., JP, JP, (19910101), vol. 48., no. 12., ISSN 0386-2186, pages 775 - 781., XP000247197 | Examination | EP0389695 | EP0454850 | by applicant | US4073733 | JPS5415029 | - New Series of Lectures on Experimental Chemistry, MARUZEN CO., LTD., (1985), pages 124 - 243 |