EP0528562 - Pedicle screw and percutaneous fixation of vertebrae [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US | ||
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew Richards Inc 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US | ||
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW DYONICS INC 160 Dascomb Road Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kambin, Parvis 239 Chester Road Devon, Pennsylvania 19333 / US | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Koepsell, Helmut Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Koepsell, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1996/03] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip, et al Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB | ||
Former [1993/08] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306935.5 | 30.07.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | US19910745474 | 15.08.1991 Original published format: US 745474 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0528562 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0528562 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
A61B17/7007 (EP,US);
A61B17/701 (EP,US);
A61B17/86 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
Y10S606/914 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/08] | Title | German: | Pedikelschraube und perkutane Fixierung von Wirbeln | [1993/08] | English: | Pedicle screw and percutaneous fixation of vertebrae | [1993/08] | French: | Vis pédiculaire et fixation percutanée de vertèbres | [1993/08] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/14] | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0330881 (SYNTHES AG [CH]); | [X]US4805602 (PUNO ROLANDO M [US], et al); | [A]DE8900080U ; | [E]US5171279 (MATHEWS HALLETT H [US]) |