EP0529827 - Process for controllably separating framed working area from remainder of the membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/09] | Process and apparatus for controllably separating framed working area from remainder of the membrane | ||
[1999/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YEN, Yung-Tsai 196 Tuscaloosa Avenue Atherton California 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states YEN, Yung-Tsai 196 Tuscaloosa Avenue Atherton, California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307080.9 | 03.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | US19910749709 | 26.08.1991 Original published format: US 749709 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529827 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529827 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
H01L21/67132 (EP,US);
G03F1/62 (KR);
G03F1/84 (EP,US);
G03F7/70866 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
Y10T428/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren um eine eingerahmte Arbeitsfläche aus der übrigbleibenden Fläche einer Folie kontrolliert zu schneiden | [1999/02] | English: | Process for controllably separating framed working area from remainder of the membrane | [1999/02] | French: | Procédé pour séparer de façon controlée la surface encadrée de travail d'une membrane du reste de celle ci | [1999/02] |
Former [1993/09] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren um eine eingerahmte Arbeitsfläsche aus der übrigbleibenden Fläsche eines Folie kontrollierbar zu scheiden | ||
Former [1993/09] | Process and apparatus for controllably separating framed working area from remainder of the membrane | ||
Former [1993/09] | Appareil et procédé pour séparer de façon controlée la surface encadrée de travail d'une membrane du reste de celle ci | Examination procedure | 29.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 13.01.1999 | SE | 13.01.1999 | AT | 03.08.1999 | IE | 03.08.1999 | LU | 03.08.1999 | PT | 03.08.1999 | ES | 04.08.1999 | BE | 31.08.1999 | CH | 31.08.1999 | DK | 31.08.1999 | LI | 31.08.1999 | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 13.01.1999 | |
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
AT | 03.08.1999 | ||
IE | 03.08.1999 | ||
LU | 03.08.1999 | ||
ES | 04.08.1999 | ||
BE | 31.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
DK | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2004/28] | GR | 13.01.1999 | |
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
AT | 03.08.1999 | ||
IE | 03.08.1999 | ||
ES | 04.08.1999 | ||
BE | 31.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
DK | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | GR | 13.01.1999 | |
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
AT | 03.08.1999 | ||
IE | 03.08.1999 | ||
BE | 31.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
DK | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2002/29] | GR | 13.01.1999 | |
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
AT | 03.08.1999 | ||
IE | 03.08.1999 | ||
BE | 31.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 13.01.1999 | |
AT | 03.08.1999 | ||
IE | 03.08.1999 | ||
BE | 31.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 03.08.1999 | |
IE | 03.08.1999 | ||
BE | 31.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 03.08.1999 | |
BE | 31.08.1999 | ||
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 31.08.1999 | |
CH | 31.08.1999 | ||
LI | 31.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 31.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0118623 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]); | [X]DE3920788 |