EP0532176 - Laser-sensitive electrophotographic lithograph printing plate material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW OJI PAPER CO., LTD. 7-5, Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [1995/27] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states OJI PAPER COMPANY LIMITED 7-5 Ginza 4-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Shiro 2-8-8, Chuodohri Nichinan-shi, Miyazaki 887 / JP | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307332.4 | 11.08.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | JP19910228915 | 09.09.1991 Original published format: JP 22891591 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532176 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532176 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/05, G03G5/09 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
G03G5/09 (EP,US);
C09B23/086 (EP,US);
G03G5/0514 (EP,US);
G03G5/0517 (EP,US);
G03G5/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/11] | Title | German: | Laserempfindliches elektrophotographisches lithographisches Druckplattenmaterial | [1993/11] | English: | Laser-sensitive electrophotographic lithograph printing plate material | [1993/11] | French: | Matériau de plaque d'impression lithographique, électrophotographique, sensible au laser | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP56130759 ; | [A]JP01222266 ; | [Y]EP0430597 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]); | [A]EP0321284 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]); | [A]DE3625766 (RICOH KK [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 005 (P-097)13 January 1982 & JP-A-56 130 759 ( CANON ) 13 October 1981, & JP56130759 A 19811013 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 540 (P-969)5 December 1989 & JP-A-01 222 266 ( TOPPAN ) 5 September 1989, & JP01222266 A 19890905 |