EP0532227 - Cellular telephony authentication arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reeds III, James Alexander 127 Southgate Road New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | 02 /
Treventi, Philip Andrew 15 Candlewood Drive Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | 03 /
Yu, I-Hsiang 9 Hickory Place Cedar Knolls, New Jersey 07927 / US | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/11] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) LTD. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307999.0 | 03.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | US19910759314 | 13.09.1991 Original published format: US 759314 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0532227 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0532227 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532227 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04Q7/38 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
H04W12/71 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/20] | H04L9/32, H04Q7/04 | ||
Former IPC [1993/11] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | Authentifizierungsvorrichtung für zellulare Telefonie | [1993/11] | English: | Cellular telephony authentication arrangement | [1993/11] | French: | Dispositif d'authentification pour système téléphonique cellulaire | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 30.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98124151.6 / EP0903887 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0463384 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [PX] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 36 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 50 * * column 7, line 32 - column 9, line 5 * * sentence 37 - sentence 57 * * column 10, line 48 - column 11, line 7 *; | [X]DE3420874 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 16 * * claim 1 *; | [A]CA2051385 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 6 * | [A] - MASMOUDI ET AL., "LES LIGNES PRIVEES VIRTUELLES", TECHNIQUE ET SCIENCE INFORMATIQUES, MONTROUGE (FR), (19910610), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 85 - 96 [A] 1,2 * page 92, column R, line 9 - line 40 * |