EP0533479 - A method and machine for the production of glassware articles by the press and blow process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VITRO CRISA CRISTALERIA, S.A. DE C.V. Doblado y Progreso, Col. Terminal Monterrey Nuevo Leon CP. 64580 / MX | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states VITRO CRISA CRISTALERIA, S.A. DE C.V. Doblado y Progreso, Col. Terminal Monterrey, Nuevo Leon CP. 64580 / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tijerina-Ramos, Victor Aldama Sur 415-7, Monterrey Nuevo Leon CP64000 / MX | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1993/12] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308494.1 | 17.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | US19910761410 | 17.09.1991 Original published format: US 761410 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0533479 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0533479 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533479 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/195, C03B9/197, C03B9/40 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
C03B9/195 (EP,US);
C03B9/295 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/11] |
Former [1993/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Glasgegenständen nach dem Pressblasverfahren | [1993/12] | English: | A method and machine for the production of glassware articles by the press and blow process | [1993/12] | French: | Méthode et machine pour la fabrication d'articles en verre selon le procédé pressé-soufflé | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE129211 ; | [A]DE102845 ; | [AD]US3142552 (JOHN MARTIN); | [AD]US4200449 (MARTIN JOHN K [MX]); | [AD]US4062668 (ZAPPIA ANTHONY T); | [AD]US4152132 (ZAPPIA ANTHONY T [US]); | [AD]US4063918 (ZAPPIA ANTHONY T); | [AD]US4152133 (ZAPPIA ANTHONY T [US]); | [AD]US1979211 (ROWE GEORGE E) |