EP0533508 - Apparatus and system for controlling vehicle's headlights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ben-Lulu, Dani c/o Yaakov Biton, Advocate, 3 Zahal Street, P.O. Box 167 Ashkelon 78594 / IL | [1993/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308581.5 | 21.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | IL19170000995 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: IL 99517 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0533508 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0533508 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/14 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1423 (EP);
B60Q2300/052 (EP);
B60Q2300/054 (EP);
B60Q2300/056 (EP);
B60Q2300/41 (EP);
B60Q2300/42 (EP);
B60Q2900/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/12] | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Steuern der Scheinwerfer eines Kraftfahrzeug | [1993/12] | English: | Apparatus and system for controlling vehicle's headlights | [1993/12] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de commande des phares d'un véhicule | [1993/12] | File destroyed: | 03.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.03.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE594700 (SERGE VASILACHE); | [Y]DE830076 (BACHMAIER & KLEMMER); | [X]GB1068252 (JOHN HAYES, et al); | [X]DE2305607 (STRUTH ALFRED BERNHARD); | [A]US4117457 (LATTA JOHN S); | [X]US5036437 (MACKS HAROLD R [US]) |