EP0541232 - Polyvinyl alcohol in combination with glyoxylated vinyl-amide polymers as creping adhesive compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/19] | Polyvinyl alcohol in combination with glyoxylated vinyl-amide polymers ascreping adhesive compositions | ||
[1995/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furman, Gary S., Jr. 108 S 12th street St. Charles, Illinois 60174 / US | 02 /
Gruen, Craig 2335 Spring Hollow Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US | 03 /
Van Luu, Phuong 2223 E. Calumet Street Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1993/19] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308751.4 | 25.09.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | US19910772765 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: US 772765 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541232 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541232 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/36, D21H17/37, D21H17/45, B31F1/12 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
D21H21/146 (EP,US);
C09J129/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08L33/26 (EP,US);
C09J133/26 (EP,US);
D21H17/36 (EP,US);
D21H17/375 (EP,US);
D21H17/455 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L33/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L29/04, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L33/26, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09J129/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09J133/26, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1993/19] | D21H17/36, D21H17/37, D21H17/45 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung von Polyvinylalkoholen und glyoxalmodifizierten Vinylamidepolymeren, als Kreppklebemittel | [1993/19] | English: | Polyvinyl alcohol in combination with glyoxylated vinyl-amide polymers as creping adhesive compositions | [1995/19] | French: | Combinaison d'alcool polyvinylique avec des polymères vinylamide glyoxylés comme adhésifs de crêpage | [1993/19] |
Former [1993/19] | Polyvinyl alcohol in combination with glyoxylated vinyl-amide polymers ascreping adhesive compositions | Examination procedure | 19.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.09.1995 | LI | 30.09.1995 | [1997/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3772407 (WILLIAMS L, et al); | [A]US4501640 (SOERENS DAVE A [US]); | [A]US4684439 (SOERENS DAVE A [US]) |