EP0541250 - Turbine disk forward seal assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cameron, Daniel Glenn 9352 Hadley Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
Albrecht, Richard William 5 Park Meadows Court Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | 03 /
Kutney, John Thomas, Jr. 412 Worthington Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION, G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC., Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309201.9 | 08.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | US19910784858 | 30.10.1991 Original published format: US 784858 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541250 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
F01D11/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/19] | Title | German: | Vorderdichtungsanordnung für eine Turbinenscheibe | [1993/19] | English: | Turbine disk forward seal assembly | [1993/19] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité avant pour un disque de turbine | [1993/19] | File destroyed: | 21.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0463955 (SNECMA [FR]); | [A]GB2042652 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]US4480958 (SCHLECHTWEG RONALD E [US]) |