EP0592735 - Grip assessment system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shah, Khalid Mahmud Block 1C, Gilman Heights, Appartment 12-24 Singapore 0410 / SG | For all designated states Semple, James Campbell Kelvincision, Unit 6, 11 Kelvin Campus, Maryhill Road Glasgow G20 0SP / GB | [1994/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309327.2 | 13.10.1992 | [1994/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0592735 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592735 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/22 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/27] |
Former [1994/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung von Handgriff | [1994/16] | English: | Grip assessment system and method | [1994/16] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour l'évaluation de poigné | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU | 20.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.12.1993 | 22.11.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.12.1993 | 22.11.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.12.1993 | 22.11.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.07.1997 | DE | 10.10.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/19] | DE | 10.10.1997 | |
FR | 05.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DE | 10.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0244933 (BENJAMIN DEXTRONICS PTY LTD [AU]); | [Y]US4884445 (SADOFF ARMIN M [US], et al); | [A]US4882677 (CURRAN THOMAS M [US]) | [A] - MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING. vol. 22, no. 3, May 1984, STEVENAGE GB pages 245 - 250 B.W.DUYM ET AL. 'Measurement of the quality of hand contractions' | [AD] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL MEDICINE vol. 62, no. 3, 1983, BALTIMORE (US) pages 135 - 144 J.C.GILBERT ET AL. 'SIMPLE METHOD TO DETERMINE SINCEREITY OF EFFORT DURING A MAXIMAL ISOMETRIC TEST OF GRIP STRENGTH' | [AD] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL MEDICINE AND REHABILITATION vol. 68, no. 2, April 1989, BALTIMORE (US) pages 73 - 80 G.A.SMITH ET AL. 'Assessing Sincerity of Effort in Maximal Grip Strength Tests' |