EP0539088 - Echinocandin b derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouffard, Frances Aileen 1521 Cooper Road Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | 02 /
Dropinski, James F. 1714 Rivendell Way Edison, NJ 08817 / US | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309348.8 | 14.10.1992 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | US19910775773 | 17.10.1991 Original published format: US 775773 | [1993/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0539088 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0539088 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/56, C07K1/00, A61K38/00 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
C07K7/56 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/17] | C07K7/56, C07K1/00, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/17] | Title | German: | Echinocandin-B-Derivat | [1993/17] | English: | Echinocandin b derivative | [1993/17] | French: | Dérivé d'échinocandine B | [1993/17] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 05.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.07.1996 | BE | 17.07.1996 | CH | 17.07.1996 | DK | 17.07.1996 | ES | 17.07.1996 | GR | 17.07.1996 | LI | 17.07.1996 | NL | 17.07.1996 | IE | 14.10.1996 | PT | 17.10.1996 | SE | 17.10.1996 | LU | 31.10.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
ES | 17.07.1996 | ||
GR | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
IE | 14.10.1996 | ||
PT | 17.10.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [2001/05] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
GR | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
IE | 14.10.1996 | ||
PT | 17.10.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
GR | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
PT | 17.10.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
DK | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
PT | 17.10.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
BE | 17.07.1996 | ||
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
PT | 17.10.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
PT | 17.10.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 17.07.1996 | |
CH | 17.07.1996 | ||
LI | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | CH | 17.07.1996 | |
LI | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0447186 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]EP0451957 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [AP]EP0459564 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 21, May 27, 1991 Columbus, Ohio, USA A.A. ADEFARATI et al. "Bio- synthesis of L-671,329, an echinocandin-type antibiotic produced by Zalerion arboricola: origins of some of the unusual amino acids and the dimethylmyristic acid side chain", page 441, column 1, abstract-no. 203 279t | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 21, 27 May 1991, Columbus, OH (US); A.A. ADEFARATI et al., p. 441, no. 203279t |