EP0539219 - Speech signal coding and decoding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wake, Yasuhiro c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Usuki, Katsunori c/o NEC Eng.Ltd., 20-4, Nishishinbashi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309733.1 | 23.10.1992 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | JP19910305363 | 24.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30536391 | [1993/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0539219 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0539219 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0539219 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04N1/32 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
H04N1/32708 (EP,US);
H04M11/068 (EP,US);
H04N1/32704 (EP,US);
H04N1/32715 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/17] | Title | German: | System zur Sprachkodierung und -dekodierung | [1993/17] | English: | Speech signal coding and decoding system | [1993/17] | French: | Système de codage et de décodage de la parole | [1993/17] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4813040 (FUTATO STEVEN P [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 8 - line 42 *; | [A]EP0339467 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [Y]US5036513 (GREENBLATT RICHARD D [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 25; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 32 * * column 6, line 18 - line 59 * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 61 *; | [A] - S. CASALE ET AL., "Statistical Voice/high-speed data multiplexing on a 64 kbit/s channel", PHOENIX CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS 1991, SCOTTSDALE , US, pages 459 - 464, XP000299078 [A] 1-3 * page 459, column R, line 29 - page 460, column R, line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCCC.1991.113849 |