EP0542453 - Strut assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.10.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTLAND HELICOPTERS LIMITED Group Patents Dept. Box 206 Westland Works Yeovil Somerset BA20 2YB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states WESTLAND HELICOPTERS LIMITED Group Patents Dept. Box 206 Westland Works Yeovil Somerset BA20 2YB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crannage, Mark Adrian "Denmead", St Cleers Orchard Somerton, Somerset TA11 6QT / GB | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Jack, Bruce J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Jack, Bruce James, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92309938.6 | 29.10.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | GB19910024081 | 13.11.1991 Original published format: GB 9124081 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542453 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/00, F16F1/36, F16F15/00, F16C7/04, F16C7/06 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
B64C27/001 (EP,US);
F16C7/04 (EP,US);
F16C7/06 (EP,US);
F16F15/04 (EP,US);
F16C2326/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/20] | Title | German: | Strebeeinheit | [1993/20] | English: | Strut assemblies | [1993/20] | French: | Contre-fiche | [1993/20] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/51] | 06.08.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB1182339 (SUD AVIATION [FR]); | [Y]DE461919 (RINGFEDER GMBH); | [APD]EP0501658 (WESTLAND HELICOPTERS [GB]) |