EP0545546 - Digital radio modulator/demodulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/23] | Digital GMSK transceiver | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES (U.K.) LIMITED Ashwood House, Pembroke Broadway Camberley Surrey GU15 3SP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES (U.K.) LIMITED Ashwood House, Pembroke Broadway Camberley, Surrey GU15 3SP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaker, David 811 Frank Drive Emmaus, Philadelphia 18049 / US | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Frain, Timothy John Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU 14 0NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Frain, Timothy John Patent Department Nokia Mobile Phones St Georges Court St Georges Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309974.1 | 30.10.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | GB19910025577 | 30.11.1991 Original published format: GB 9125577 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0545546 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0545546 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545546 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/20, H04L27/22 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
H04L27/2092 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/23] | H04L27/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/23] | Title | German: | Digitaler Funk-Modulator/Demodulator | [1998/37] | English: | Digital radio modulator/demodulator | [1998/37] | French: | Modulateur/démodulateur radio numérique | [1998/37] |
Former [1993/23] | Digitaler GMSK-Sender/Empfänger | ||
Former [1993/23] | Digital GMSK transceiver | ||
Former [1993/23] | Emetteur/récepteur numérique pour signaux GMSK | Examination procedure | 18.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55147060 ; | [X]US4550292 (SMITH STEPHEN F [US]); | [X]US4584541 (NOSSEN EDWARD J [US]); | [A]US4680556 (NAKAMURA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) | [X] - 11TH ANNUAL IEEE GALLIUM ARSENIDE INTEGRATED CIRCUIT SYMPOSIUM, 22-25 OCTOBER 1989, SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, US pages 49 - 52 LA MACCHIA M. P. ET AL.: 'FLIGHT GaAs NUMERICALLY CONTROLLED OSCILLATOR' | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 19 (E-44)(691) 4 February 1981 & JP-A-55 147 060 ( NIPPON DENKI ) 15 November 1980, & JP55147060 A 19801115 |