EP0551721 - Gallium nitride base semiconductor device and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amano, Hiroshi Nijigaokahigashidanchi Room No. 19-103, No. 21, Kamioka-cho, 2-chome, Meito-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states Akasaki, Isamu No. 1-38-805, Jyoshin 1-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states Amano, Hiroshi Nijigaokahigashidanchi Room No. 19-103, No. 21, Kamioka-cho, 2-chome, Meito-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Akasaki, Isamu No. 1-38-805, Jyoshin 1-chome, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | |||
For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | |||
For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Tetsuya No.96,Ikatsu-cho 2-chome,Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Akasaki, Isamu No.1-38-805,Jyoshin 1-chome,Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Atsushi, c/o Corp.R.& D.Lab. Pioneer Electronic Corp.,6-1-1,Fujimi Tsurgashima-shi, Saitama 350-02 / JP | 04 /
Manabe, Katsuhide Toyoda Gosei Technical Centre 30,Nishinomachi,Kitajima-cho Inazawa-shi, Aichi-ken 492 / JP | 05 /
Amano, Hiroshi Nijigaokahigashidanchi Room No.19-103,No.21,Kamioka-cho 2-chome Meito-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310314.7 | 12.11.1992 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | JP19910335255 | 18.12.1991 Original published format: JP 33525591 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0551721 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0551721 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551721 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/201, H01L21/20 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L21/02639 (EP,US);
H01L21/02647 (EP,US);
H01L29/201 (EP,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,US);
Y10S148/065 (EP,US);
Y10S148/113 (EP,US);
Y10S438/933 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/29] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung auf Basis von Gallium-Nitrid und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1993/29] | English: | Gallium nitride base semiconductor device and method of fabricating the same | [1993/29] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur à base de nitrure de gallium et méthode pour sa fabrication | [1993/29] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0460710 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0383215 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0377940 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH03218625 ; | [A]JPH03203388 ; | [A]JPS6230696 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911218), vol. 015, no. 502, Database accession no. (E - 1147), & JP03218625 A 19910926 (UNIV NAGOYA) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911128), vol. 015, no. 470, Database accession no. (E - 1139), & JP03203388 A 19910905 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870703), vol. 011, no. 206, Database accession no. (C - 433), & JP62030696 A 19870209 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - Matsuoka T et al, "Growth and properties of a wide-gap semiconductor InGaN", OPTOELECTRONICS - DEVICES AND TECHNOLOGIES, JUNE 1990, JAPAN, VOL. 5, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 53 - 64, ISSN 0912-5434 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |