EP0543634 - Improvements in coating processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUBLIC HEALTH LABORATORY SERVICE BOARD 61 Colindale Avenue London NW9 5EQ / GB | [1993/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayat, Umar 1 Sprinkfield Road Birkby, Huddersfield HD2 2AY / GB | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1993/21] | Application number, filing date | 92310513.4 | 18.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | GB19910024467 | 18.11.1991 Original published format: GB 9124467 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0543634 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/18, B29C59/14, B05D3/14, B05D1/18 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
C08J7/18 (EP);
B05D3/144 (EP);
B29C59/14 (EP);
B29K2033/12 (EP);
B29K2069/00 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/21] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Beschichtungsverfahren | [1993/21] | English: | Improvements in coating processes | [1993/21] | French: | Améliorations aux procédés de revêtement | [1993/21] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 21.07.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009017 ; | [X]US4131691 ; | [YD]US4096315 ; | [A]US5041303 ; | [A]US4649071 | [Y] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90055145[08] & JP-A-2 009 017 (TDK CORP.) 12 January 1990, & JP2009017 A 19900112 |