EP0544466 - Tri-arginine insulins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, James Arthur 4272 Woodland Streams Drive Greenwood, Indiana 46143 / US | 02 /
Lambooy, Peter Karl 8269 Castle Ridge Lane Indianapolis, Indiana 46256 / US | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310616.5 | 20.11.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | US19910801163 | 26.11.1991 Original published format: US 801163 | [1993/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544466 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/40 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/62 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/28 (KR);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/22] | Title | German: | Triarginine Insuline | [1993/22] | English: | Tri-arginine insulins | [1993/22] | French: | Tri-arginine insulines | [1993/22] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 11.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/47] | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0376156 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0427162 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL vol. 186, 1980, pages 945 - 952 P. R\SEN ET AL. 'Binding of Insulin to Bovine Liver Plasma Membrane' |