EP0543670 - A miniature electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MABUCHI MOTOR KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 430, Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states MABUCHI MOTOR KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 430, Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Takanobu, Mabuchi Motor Kabushiki Kaisha No. 430 Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Take, Masao, Mabuchi Motor Kabushiki Kaisha No. 430 Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsushita, Ikuo, Mabuchi Motor Kabushiki Kaisha No. 430 Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Mifune, Masahiro, Mabuchi Motor Kabushiki Kaisha No. 430 Matsuhidai Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310643.9 | 20.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | JP19910095300 | 21.11.1991 Original published format: JP 9530091 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0543670 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0543670 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543670 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/22, H02K3/52, H02K37/14, H01F5/02 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
H01F5/02 (EP,US);
H02K3/525 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/21] | H02K5/22, H02K3/52, H02K37/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/21] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Kleinmotor | [1993/21] | English: | A miniature electric motor | [1993/21] | French: | Moteur électrique miniature | [1993/21] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 16.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61049406 ; | [A]US5004941 (OHZEKI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0307704 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 209 (E-421)(2265) 22 July 1986 & JP-A-61 049 406 ( MATSUSHITA ) 11 March 1986, & JP61049406 A 19860311 |