EP0544486 - Post detection integration method and apparatus for pulse compression radar utilizing surface acoustic wave (SAW) matched filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace, P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles California 90080-0028 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace, P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles, California 90080-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nourrcier, Charles E. 5523 Bonfair Avenue Lakewood, California 90712 / US | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310703.1 | 23.11.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | US19910797607 | 25.11.1991 Original published format: US 797607 | [1993/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544486 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544486 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/28 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
G01S13/282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung für Impulskompressionsradarsystem zur Nachintegration mit angepassten, akustischen Oberflächenwellenfiltern (SAW) | [1993/22] | English: | Post detection integration method and apparatus for pulse compression radar utilizing surface acoustic wave (SAW) matched filters | [1993/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de la post-intégration dans un système radar du type à compression d'impulsion utilisant des filtres adaptés aux ondes acoustiques de surface (SAW) | [1993/22] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4333080 (COLLINS JOHN D, et al); | [A]US4443799 (RUBIN WILLIAM L [US]); | [AD]US4662741 (DUVALL III ROBERT L [US], et al) |