EP0544499 - Junction box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LIMITED Leighswood Road, Aldridge Walsall West Midlands WS9 8DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LIMITED Leighswood Road, Aldridge Walsall, West Midlands WS9 8DS / GB | ||
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LIMITED Leighswood Road Aldridge Walsall Staffordshire WS9 8DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norris, Trevor William 7 Westbourn Drive Ashton-under-Lyne, Lancashire / GB | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Knowles, Audrey Elizabeth 624 Pershore Road Selly Park Birmingham B29 7HG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Knowles, Audrey Elizabeth 624 Pershore Road Selly Park Birmingham B29 7HG / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310736.1 | 24.11.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | GB19910025386 | 28.11.1991 Original published format: GB 9125386 | [1993/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544499 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544499 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/16, H01R13/658 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
H02G3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/48] |
Former [1993/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindergehäuse | [1993/22] | English: | Junction box | [1993/22] | French: | Boîte de jonction | [1993/22] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 24.01.1996 | ES | 24.01.1996 | GR | 24.01.1996 | IT | 24.01.1996 | NL | 24.01.1996 | PT | 24.04.1996 | SE | 24.04.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | DK | 24.01.1996 | |
ES | 24.01.1996 | ||
GR | 24.01.1996 | ||
IT | 24.01.1996 | ||
NL | 24.01.1996 | ||
PT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.04.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 24.01.1996 | |
ES | 24.01.1996 | ||
GR | 24.01.1996 | ||
IT | 24.01.1996 | ||
PT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.04.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 24.01.1996 | |
GR | 24.01.1996 | ||
IT | 24.01.1996 | ||
PT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.04.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 24.01.1996 | |
IT | 24.01.1996 | ||
PT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 24.01.1996 | |
PT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | PT | 24.04.1996 | |
SE | 24.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/38] | SE | 24.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3927249 (PEARSE JAMES N); | [A]DE3242073 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2232828 (BARLIAN TECHNIK LIMITED [GB]) |