EP0559986 - Method for producing semiconductor wafer and substrate used for producing the semiconductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyashita, Motoharu, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Optoelect. and Microwave Devices R&D Lab., No. 1 Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayafuji, Norio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Optoelect. and Microwave Devices R&D Lab., No. 1 Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Mihashi, Yutaka, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Optoelect. and Microwave Devices R&D Lab., No. 1 Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310796.5 | 25.11.1992 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | JP19920089416 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: JP 8941692 | [1993/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0559986 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0559986 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559986 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C30B33/00, H01L21/00 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
B28D5/0005 (EP,US);
B28D5/0011 (EP,US);
C30B33/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/219 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24298 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24306 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterplätchens und Substrat für die Herstellung eines Halbleiters | [1993/37] | English: | Method for producing semiconductor wafer and substrate used for producing the semiconductor | [1993/37] | French: | Méthode pour la production de pastilles semi-conductrices et un substrat utilisé pour produire le semi-conducteur | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.03.1996 | NL | 27.03.1996 | DE | 28.06.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 27.03.1996 | |
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | DE | 28.06.1996 | |
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | DE | 28.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4488930 (KOE KIYOHIKO [JP]); | [A]EP0221454 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JPS62225019 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880326), vol. 12, no. 94, Database accession no. (E - 593), & JP62225019 A 19871003 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - JACKSEN, "Materials and technology of wafering", SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, WASHINGTON US, (198507), vol. 28, no. 7, pages 107 - 114 |