EP0549156 - Process for oligomerizing olefins using titanium salts or zirconium salts deposited on silicon dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO CHEMICAL COMPANY 3040 Post Oak Boulevard Houston Texas 77056 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states TEXACO CHEMICAL COMPANY 3040 Post Oak Boulevard Houston, Texas 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanderson, John Ronald 15290 Faubion Trail Leander, Texas 78641 / US | 02 /
Knifton, John Frederick 10900 Catskill Trail Austin, Texas 78726 / US | 03 /
Marquis, Edward Thomas 9004 Collin Field Drive Austin, Texas 78758 / US | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310972.2 | 01.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | US19910816343 | 23.12.1991 Original published format: US 816343 | US19920923204 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: US 923204 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549156 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/10, B01J21/08, B01J21/16, // C07C2/16, C07C2/26, C07C2/14, C07C2/18, B01J27/053, B01J31/04, B01J27/18, B01J27/25 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
B01J21/08 (EP);
B01J37/088 (EP);
C07C2/10 (EP);
C07C2521/06 (EP);
C07C2521/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Oligomerisierung von Olefinen mit Verwendung von auf Siliciumdioxyd abgesetzten Titan- oder Sirkonsalzen | [1993/26] | English: | Process for oligomerizing olefins using titanium salts or zirconium salts deposited on silicon dioxide | [1993/26] | French: | Procédé pour l'oligomérisation d'oléfines utilisant des sels de titane ou de zirconium déposé sur de dioxyde de silice | [1993/26] | File destroyed: | 30.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/40] | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2249583 ; | [A]US4024080 |