EP0549160 - Connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uratsuji, Kazumi 22-8, Nishimagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311008.4 | 02.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910355994 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: JP 35599491 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549160 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549160 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/10 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP,US);
H05K7/1069 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/26] | Title | German: | Verbinder | [1993/26] | English: | Connector | [1993/26] | French: | Connecteur | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0426306 (YAMAICHI ELECTRIC MFG [JP]); | [A]GB2021878 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 123 (E-733)27 March 1989 & JP-63 291 375 ( YAMAICHI ELECTRIC MFG.CO. ) 29 November 1988 |