EP0545724 - Cigarette hopper vane jam prevention device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brinker, Reiner G. 5424 Camille Drive Mechanicsville, Virginia 23111 / US | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311079.5 | 04.12.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | US19910802340 | 04.12.1991 Original published format: US 802340 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545724 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/35, A24C5/31, A24C5/32, B65B19/04 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B65B19/04 (EP,US);
A24C5/31 (EP,US);
A24C5/325 (EP,US);
A24C5/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verhindern der Verstopfung der Rinne in einem Zigarettentrichter | [1993/23] | English: | Cigarette hopper vane jam prevention device | [1993/23] | French: | Dispositif pour la prévention du blocage des canaux dans une trémie pour cigarettes | [1993/23] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 29.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0443982 (TABAC FAB REUNIES SA [CH]); | [A]DE2826539 (MOLINS LTD); | [A]US3501052 (RUDSZINAT WILLY); | [A]EP0277363 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) |