EP0546782 - Control device for a plurality of fuel dispensers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TATSUNO CORPORATION 12-13, Shibaura 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Niichi, c/o Tatsuno Corporation 12-13, Shibaura 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takagi, Hitoshi, c/o Tatsuno Corporation 12-13, Shibaura 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Matsumura, Miyuki, c/o Tatsuno Corporation 12-13, Shibaura 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Quest, Barry, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311129.8 | 07.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | JP19910350269 | 09.12.1991 Original published format: JP 35026991 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546782 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546782 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/08 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
B67D7/08 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Steuerung einer Anzahl von Zapfsäulen | [1993/24] | English: | Control device for a plurality of fuel dispensers | [1993/24] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'un nombre de distributeurs d'hydrocarbure | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Request for further processing for: | 25.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.1996 | Decision despatched | 24.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 12.08.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0112609 (TOKYO TATSUNO KK [JP]); | [A]US4630754 (KOMUKAI SHIGEMI [JP]); | [X]WO8900974 (HOLLIDGE PETER WILLIAM [CA]) | Examination | JPS5952366 |