EP0547819 - Process for the making of a smoking product by extrusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House, 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | ||
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states BRITISH-AMERICAN TOBACCO COMPANY LIMITED Millbank, Knowle Green Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hemsley, Stephen Ross 87 Middlebridge Street Romsey, Hampshire S051 8HJ / GB | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | MacLean, Kenneth John Hamson, et al Patents Department British-American Tobacco Company Limited Technology Centre Regents Park Road Southampton S015 8TL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | MacLean, Kenneth John Hamson, et al Patents Section British-American Tobacco Company Ltd. Technology Centre Regents Park Road Southampton, S09 1PE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311132.2 | 07.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | GB19910026828 | 18.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9126828 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0547819 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0547819 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547819 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A24B3/14, A24B15/14, A24B15/16, A24B15/28 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
A24B15/14 (EP,US);
A24B3/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/25] | A24B3/14, A24B15/14, A24B15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Rauchartikeln durch Extrusion | [1993/25] | English: | Process for the making of a smoking product by extrusion | [1993/25] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'articles à fumer par extrusion | [1993/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 07.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0162671 (PHILIP MORRIS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8-10 * claims 1,7-9,11 * * page 7, line 36 - page 10, line 32 ** examples 1,3 *; | [Y]GB2201081 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YD]EP0325476 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [YD] 1-10 * claim - * * figure 2 * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 37 * * column 7, line 9 - line 13 * * column 9, line 57 - column 10, line 37 * |