EP0547887 - Rail car drawbar arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMSTED Industries Incorporated 205 North Michigan Avenue, 44th Floor, Boulevard Towers South Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states AMSTED Industries Incorporated 205 North Michigan Avenue 44th Floor Boulevard Towers South Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufhold, Horst T. 28 Richmond Lane Aurora, IL 60504 / US | 02 /
Steffen, John J. 1174 Brockton Court Aurora, IL 60504 / US | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311508.3 | 16.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | US19910807321 | 16.12.1991 Original published format: US 807321 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0547887 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547887 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B61G5/02 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
B61G5/02 (EP,US);
B61G5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, PT [1993/25] | Title | German: | Zugstangenvorrichtung für Bahnwaggon | [1993/25] | English: | Rail car drawbar arrangement | [1993/25] | French: | Dispositif de barre de traction pour wagon ferroviaire | [1993/25] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 04.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2078647 (AMSTED IND INC); | [AD]US4456133 (ALTHERR RUSSELL G [US], et al); | [A]US4549666 (ALTHERR RUSSELL G [US], et al); | [A]US4555033 (MILLER ROY W [US]); | [AD]US4700853 (ALTHERR RUSSELL G [US], et al) |