EP0547920 - Recombinant thermostable DNA polymerase from archaebacteria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS, INC. 32, Tozer Road Beverly Massachusetts 01915 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS, INC. 32, Tozer Road Beverly Massachusetts 01915 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Comb, Donald G. 109, Water Street Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 02 /
Perler, Francine 74A, Fuller Street Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 03 /
Kucera, Rebecca 29, Neptune Street Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 04 /
Jack, William E. 31, Mayflower Drive Wenham, MA 01984 / US | [2002/09] |
Former [1993/25] | 01 /
Comb, Donald G. 109, Water Street Beverly, Massachusetts 01915 / US | ||
02 /
Perler, Francine 74A, Fuller Street Brookline, Massachusetts 02146 / US | |||
03 /
Kucera, Rebecca 29, Neptune Street Beverly, Massachusetts 01915 / US | |||
04 /
Jack, William E. 31, Mayflower Drive Wenham, Massachusetts 01984 / US | Representative(s) | Davies, Jonathan Mark Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Davies, Jonathan Mark Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311622.2 | 18.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | US19910811421 | 18.12.1991 Original published format: US 811421 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0547920 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0547920 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547920 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N9/12, C12Q1/68, C12P21/08, C12P21/02 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
C12N9/1252 (EP);
C07K16/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/25] | Title | German: | Rekombinante thermostabile DNA-Polymerase von Archaebakterie | [1993/25] | English: | Recombinant thermostable DNA polymerase from archaebacteria | [1993/25] | French: | DNA polymérase thermostable recombinante d'Archaebactérie | [1993/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 03.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 15.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Request for further processing for: | 27.01.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.1998 | Decision despatched | 20.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 02.04.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2002 | BE | 27.02.2002 | CH | 27.02.2002 | GR | 27.02.2002 | IT | 27.02.2002 | LI | 27.02.2002 | NL | 27.02.2002 | DK | 27.05.2002 | PT | 27.05.2002 | SE | 27.05.2002 | ES | 29.08.2002 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
DK | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
ES | 29.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
DK | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.02.2002 | |
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 27.02.2002 | |
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0455430 (NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS INC [US]) | [A] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. vol. 19, no. 18, 25 September 1991, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US pages 4967 - 4973 P.MATTILA 'Fidelity of DNA synthesis by the Thermococcus litoralis DNA polymerase-an extremely heat stable enzyme with proofreading activity' | Examination | WO9209689 | EP0547359 | - SOUTHWORTH M.W. ET AL, "Cloning of thermostable DNA polymerases from hyperthermophilic marine Archaea with emphasis on Thermococcus sp. 9°N-7 and mutations affecting 3'-5' exonuclease activity", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, USA, (199605), vol. 93, pages 5281 - 5285 |