EP0549371 - Combination connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumida, Tatsuya, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City, Mie Pref. / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1993/26] | Flegg, Christopher Frederick, et al Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311822.8 | 24.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910346966 | 27.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34696691 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0549371 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0549371 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549371 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/62, H01R13/436, H01R13/629, H01R13/518 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
H01R13/62933 (EP,US);
H01R13/516 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/26] | H01R13/62, H01R13/436 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/26] | Title | German: | Verbindungssystem | [1993/26] | English: | Combination connector | [1993/26] | French: | Système de connexion | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 05.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5035634 (HASIRCOGLU ALEXANDER W [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 4 - column 9, line 39; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR1517332 (AMP INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0123590 (DEUTSCH SA [FR]) [A] 4 * page 4, line 19 - page 8; figures 1-14 * |