EP0579884 - Ring lock connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. (a Delaware corporation) 1330 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019-5490 / US | [1994/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muzslay, Steven Zoltan 19542 Waterbury Lane Huntington Beach, California 92646 / US | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Vaufrouard, John Charles Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [1994/35] |
Former [1994/04] | Vaufrouard, John Charles Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311862.4 | 30.12.1992 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | US19920914727 | 20.07.1992 Original published format: US 914727 | [1994/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579884 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579884 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
B60R21/017 (EP,US);
B60R21/16 (KR);
H01R13/6277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/04] | Title | German: | Verbinder mit Ringverriegelung | [1994/04] | English: | Ring lock connector | [1994/04] | French: | Connecteur à bague de verrouillage | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0050575 (RADIALL SA [FR]) [A] 1,9 * page 5, line 25 - line 32; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE4029217 (DANFOSS-FLENSBURG GMBH.) [A] 12,17 * column 2, line 35 - line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2554543 (GROMELLE RAYMOND [FR]) [A] 1,9 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 13; figures 1-3 * |